US SB3895 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend and authorize annual appropriations for the United States Commission on International Religious Freedom through fiscal year 2024.
Title
United States Commission on International Religious Freedom Reauthorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 402 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-181. |
2022-09-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 4 (Roll no. 438). (text: CR H7898) |
2022-09-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7944-7945) |
2022-09-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3895. |
2022-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7898-7899) |
2022-09-19 | House | Mr. Malinowski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-07-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-07-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3535; text: CR S3535) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 406. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7829 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.