US SB389 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Society of the First Infantry Division to modify the First Division Monument located on federal land in Presidential Park, District of Columbia, to honor members of the First Infantry Division of the U.S. Army who died during U.S. operations, including Operation Desert Storm, Operation Iraqi Freedom, Operation New Dawn, and Operation Enduring Freedom. The First Infantry Division must provide the society with a list of names to be added to the monument. The Commemorative Works Act, which prohibits monuments to military units, shall not apply to this authorization. Federal funds may not be used to pay the society for the modification.
Title
FIRST Act First Infantry Recognition of Sacrifice in Theater Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1088 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Asia
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Asia
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition