US SB3883 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to make payments to Puerto Rico for expenditures by its taxpayer relating to the earned income tax credit (EITC). The bill also requires payments to U.S. possessions with mirror code tax systems (i.e., the Virgin Islands, Guam, and the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands) for a specified percentage of the cost of the EITC in calendar years 2020-2024.
Title
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make the earned income tax credit available to residents of possessions of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3300 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
HB3307 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5687 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 416.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB3307 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5687 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 416.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Caribbean area
Government information and archives
Guam
Income tax credits
Inflation and prices
Northern Mariana Islands
Poverty and welfare assistance
Puerto Rico
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Wages and earnings
Caribbean area
Government information and archives
Guam
Income tax credits
Inflation and prices
Northern Mariana Islands
Poverty and welfare assistance
Puerto Rico
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3883/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3883/BILLS-116s3883is.pdf |