US SB3873 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the outdoor amphitheater at the Blue Ridge Music Center in Galax, Virginia, as the "Rock Boucher Amphitheater".
Title
A bill to designate the outdoor amphitheater at the Blue Ridge Music Center in Galax, Virginia, as the "Rock Boucher Amphitheater".
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10104-10105; text: CR S10105) |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |