US SB3846 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the United States to observe a moment of silence on June 1, 2020, to honor the memory of the lives lost in the United States due to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic.
Title
COVID-19 Pandemic Moment of Silence Act
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-06-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2634; text: CR S2634) |
Same As/Similar To
SB3817 (Same As) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7070 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7070 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional tributes
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Congressional tributes
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents