US SB383 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-38.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-38.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the capture, utilization, and sequestration of carbon dioxide. The Environmental Protection Agency must (1) establish a competitive prize program for certain technology projects that capture carbon dioxide directly from the air, (2) research and develop technologies or approaches that transform carbon dioxide generated by industrial processes into a product of commercial value, and (3) support research and infrastructure activities relating to carbon dioxide utilization by providing technical and financial assistance. The bill includes the construction of infrastructure for carbon capture (e.g., carbon dioxide pipelines) among those projects subject to performance schedules designed to reduce permitting and project delivery time. The Government Accountability Office must issue a report that identifies grant programs that research carbon capture and utilization technologies and examines whether the programs overlap. The Council on Environmental Quality (CEQ) must publish guidance to (1) facilitate reviews associated with the deployment of carbon capture, utilization, and sequestration projects and carbon dioxide pipelines; and (2) support the development of such projects and pipelines. The CEQ must also establish at least two task forces to (1) identify challenges and successes that permitting authorities and project developers and operators face, and (2) improve the performance of the permitting process and regional coordination.
Title
USE IT Act Utilizing Significant Emissions with Innovative Technologies Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-38. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 70. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-5. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1166 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB5865 (Related) 2020-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB5865 (Related) 2020-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Income tax credits
Infrastructure development
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Pipelines
Research administration and funding
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Income tax credits
Infrastructure development
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Pipelines
Research administration and funding
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization