US SB3785 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to eliminate the restriction on veterans concurrently serving in the Offices of Administrator and Deputy Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration.
Title
A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to eliminate the restriction on veterans concurrently serving in the Offices of Administrator and Deputy Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-04-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2082; text: CR S2082) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 317. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |