US SB3744 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-145. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2020 This bill imposes sanctions on foreign individuals and entities responsible for human rights abuses in China's Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous region and requires various reports on the topic. The President shall periodically report to Congress a list identifying foreign individuals and entities responsible for such human rights abuses. The President shall impose (1) property-blocking sanctions on the identified individuals and entities, and (2) visa-blocking sanctions on the identified individuals. The bill requires reports to Congress on (1) human rights abuses in Xinjiang; (2) efforts to protect U.S. citizens and residents, including ethnic Uyghurs and Chinese nationals studying or working in the United States, from harassment and intimidation by the Chinese government; and (3) the Chinese government's acquisition and development of technology to facilitate internment and mass surveillance in Xinjiang. The Office of the Director of National Intelligence shall submit a classified report to Congress on (1) Chinese government policies in Xinjiang that constitute gross violations of human rights, and (2) the scope and scale of the detention and forced labor of Muslim minority groups in China.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2020

Sponsors

Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO]
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT]Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA]
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. John Thune [R-SD]

Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 110 (Y: 413 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-145. (TXT | PDF)
2020-06-17HouseSigned by President.
2020-06-08HousePresented to President.
2020-05-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-05-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 1 (Roll no. 110). (text: CR H2293-2295)
2020-05-27HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2311-2312)
2020-05-27HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-05-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3744.
2020-05-27HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2293-2300)
2020-05-27HouseMr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-05-15HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House.
2020-05-15SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-05-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2458-2461; text: CR S2459-2461)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback