US SB3744 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Data Care Act of 2018
Title
Data Care Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2356 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB7160 (Related) 2018-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB964 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2842 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
SB3639 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7160 (Related) 2018-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB964 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2842 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
SB3639 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3744/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3744/BILLS-115s3744is.pdf |