US SB3714 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prioritize United States energy independence, and for other purposes.
Title
American Energy Independence Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6884 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB684 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB171 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB684 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB171 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3714/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3714/BILLS-117s3714is.pdf |