US SB3706 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-102.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-102.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the application of certain provisions of the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000 for fiscal year 2021.
Title
A bill to provide for the application of certain provisions of the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000 for fiscal year 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-102. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-02-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1156) |
2022-02-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3706. |
2022-02-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1155-1156) |
2022-02-28 | House | Mr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-02-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-02-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S802-803; text: CR S803) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6435 (Same As) 2022-12-14 - Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-639, Part I.