US SB3645 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000.
Title
A bill to extend the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2340 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB1027 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3753 (Related) 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7588)
SB1027 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3753 (Related) 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7588)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3645/BILLS-115s3645is.pdf |