US SB3606 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to reauthorize the Earthquake Hazards Reduction Act of 1977, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2024

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-10HouseHeld at the desk.
2024-12-10HouseReceived in the House.
2024-12-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2024-12-05SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6853-6855; text: CR S6853-6855)
2024-09-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
2024-09-24SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2024-07-31SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2024-01-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S150)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback