US SB3606 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on August 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to eliminate the requirement to specify an effective period of transfer of Post-9/11 educational assistance to a dependent, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to eliminate the requirement to specify an effective period of transfer of Post-9/11 educational assistance to a dependent, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-08-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4033) |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4033) |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6458 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB6604 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-297.
HB6604 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-297.