US SB3600 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve the cybersecurity of the Federal Government, and for other purposes.
Title
Strengthening American Cybersecurity Act of 2022 Federal Secure Cloud Improvement and Jobs Act of 2022 Cyber Incident Reporting for Critical Infrastructure Act of 2022 Federal Information Security Modernization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-03-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S897-919) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.4954 Amendment SA 4954 proposed by Senator Peters for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S897; text: CR S897) To improve the bill. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.4953 Amendment SA 4953 proposed by Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S897; text: CR S897) To amend the Federal Cybersecurity Enhancement Act of 2015 to require Federal agencies to obtain exemptions from certain cybersecurity requirements in order to avoid compliance with those requirements. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.4953 Amendment SA 4953 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.4954 Amendment SA 4954 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S896-919) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6497 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB3099 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 383.
HB8956 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3099 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 383.
HB8956 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.