US SB3572 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-17-2)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

United States Marshals Service 225th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, in commemoration of the 225th anniversary of the establishment of the United States Marshals Service, to mint and issue $5 gold and $1 silver coins emblematic of the 225 years of exemplary and unparalleled achievements of the U.S. Marshals Service. Requires all such coin sales to include a surcharge of: (1) $35 per $5 coin; and (2) $10 per $1 coin. Requires distribution of the first $5 million to the Director of the United States Marshals Service National Museum, for the preservation, maintenance, and display of artifacts and documents of the U.S. Marshals Service. Requires distribution of: (1) $1 million to the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children; (2) $1 million to the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial Fund in support of the National Law Enforcement Museum and the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial; (3) $1 million to the Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association; (4) $500,000 to the William "Bill" Degan Scholarship Fund (provides scholarships for spouses and children of law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty); (5) $500,000 to the Robert D. May Scholarship Fund (provides scholarships for spouses and children of law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty); (6) $500,000 to the Community Oriented Policing Service; and (7) $500,000 to the Retired United States Marshals Service Association. Authorizes the Secretary to strike and sell bronze duplicates of the $5 gold coins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Marshals Service 225th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act

Sponsors

Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN]Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT]Sen. Evan Bayh [D-IN]
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK]Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM]Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA]Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA]
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]Sen. Roland Burris [D-IL]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA]Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS]
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Kent Conrad [D-ND]Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]
Sen. Christopher Dodd [D-CT]Sen. Byron Dorgan [D-ND]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. Al Franken [D-MN]
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Carte Goodwin [D-WV]Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]
Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA]Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT]Sen. Daniel Inouye [D-HI]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD]Sen. Edward Kaufman [D-DE]Sen. John Kerry [D-MA]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI]Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA]Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ]Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI]
Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT]Sen. Blanche Lincoln [D-AR]Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL]
Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE]Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV]
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV]Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO]Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM]
Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-13 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2799 (Related) 2009-06-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5680 (Related) 2010-07-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB2106 (Related) 2009-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback