US SB3553 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-438.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-438.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business ACE Act Small Business Access to Capital and Efficiency Act This bill amends the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to revise the loan amount above which a real estate appraisal is required for the commercial real property securing a Certified Development Company loan. Specifically, the bill ties the amount to the federal banking regulator appraisal threshold. (Currently, an appraisal is required for a loan of more than $250,000.)
Title
Small Business ACE Act Small Business Access to Capital and Efficiency Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-438. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 634. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-10-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6348 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Presented to President.