US SB3552 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide an increased allocation of funding under certain programs for assistance in areas of persistent poverty, and for other purposes.
Title
Targeting Resources to Communities in Need Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487. |
2022-09-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-148. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6531 (Related) 2022-05-19 - Received in the Senate.
HR1119 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1119 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.