US SB3504 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Delay REAL ID Act This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security to extend the deadline by which states are required to meet the driver's license and identification card issuance requirements under the Real ID Act of 2005 until not earlier than September 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delay REAL ID Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6372 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback