US SB35 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-24-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a Congressional Gold Medal to U.S. Capitol Police Officer Eugene Goodman for his actions to protect the Senate chamber during the security breach at the U.S. Capitol on January 6, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Officer Eugene Goodman Congressional Gold Medal Act

Sponsors

Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]
Sen. James Risch [R-ID]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]
Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE]Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA]Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO]
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-02-18HouseReceived in the House.
2021-02-16SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-02-12SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S694-695)
2021-02-12SenateS.Amdt.890 Amendment SA 890 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2021-02-12SenateS.Amdt.890 Amendment SA 890 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Van Hollen. (consideration: CR S694-695; text: CR S694-695) In the nature of a substitute.
2021-02-12SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S694-695)
2021-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2021-01-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB305 (Same As) 2021-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback