US SB3492 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to address the importance of foreign affairs training in national security, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to address the importance of foreign affairs training in national security, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S190-191) |
Same As/Similar To
HB8012 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.