US SB3491 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a commission to reform and modernize the Department of State.
Title
Commission on Reform and Modernization of the Department of State Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8536 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB4653 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
HB8788 (Related) 2022-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB4653 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
HB8788 (Related) 2022-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.