US SB3476 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 619.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 619.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018 This bill amends the United States Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria Act of 2003 to extend certain provisions related to the U.S. President's Emergency Plan for AIDS Relief (PEPFAR), a U.S. governmental initiative addressing the global HIV/AIDS epidemic. Specifically, the bill extends through FY2023 provisions that: require the Inspectors General of the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for Global Media, jointly with the Department of Health and Human Services and the U.S. Agency for International Development, to coordinate and conduct oversight of PEPFAR programs; limit U.S. contributions to the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria to 33% of funds contributed from all sources; require that certain fund contributions be withheld under specified circumstances; require that at least half of the PEPFAR budget be allocated for specified HIV/AIDS treatment and care; and require that at least 10% of such budget be expended for assistance to orphans and other children. The bill also extends through FY2024 annual reporting requirements relating to HIV/AIDS treatment providers and costs.
Title
PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 619. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6651 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-305.
HB6856 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB6856 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Africa
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Drug therapy
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
World health
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Drug therapy
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
World health