US SB347 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve the collection and review of maternal health data to address maternal mortality, serve maternal morbidity, and other adverse maternal health outcomes.
Title
Data to Save Moms Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB959 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB346 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB925 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
HB7585 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB346 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB925 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
HB7585 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/347/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s347/BILLS-117s347is.pdf |