US SB3458 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 238.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 238.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to provide enhanced penalties for convicted murderers who kill or target America's public safety officers.
Title
Thin Blue Line Act
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 238. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB72 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1595 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1595 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3458/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3458/BILLS-117s3458pcs.pdf |