US SB3451 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-173.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-173.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to include certain computer-related projects in the Federal permitting program under title XLI of the FAST Act, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to include certain computer-related projects in the Federal permitting program under title XLI of the FAST Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 303 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-173. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-07-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 303 - 89 (Roll no. 417). (text: 7/28/2022 CR H7400) |
2022-07-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7533-7534) |
2022-07-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-07-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3451. |
2022-07-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7400-7401) |
2022-07-28 | House | Mr. Costa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-01-11 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-01-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S121; text: CR S121) |
Same As/Similar To
HB7870 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.