US SB3447 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the National Service Animals Monument Corporation to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.
Title
National Service Animals Memorial Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3438 (Related) 2022-01-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6353 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6353 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3447/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3447/BILLS-117s3447is.pdf |