US SB3444 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Lake Charles, Louisiana, as the "Douglas Fournet Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic". This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Lake Charles, Louisiana, as the "Douglas Fournet Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic."
Title
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Lake Charles, Louisiana, as the "Douglas Fournet Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic".
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 465 (Y: 388 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 465). (text: CR H10428) |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10441-10442) |
2018-12-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3444. |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10428) |
2018-12-20 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4160 Amendment SA 4160 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4160 Amendment SA 4160 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Cassidy. (consideration: CR S7820; text: CR S7820) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7820) |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6839 (Related) 2018-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Louisiana
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Louisiana
Veterans' medical care