US SB3369 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - Became Public Law No: 117-226.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - Became Public Law No: 117-226.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the medical center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in metropolitan Atlanta, Georgia, as the "Joseph Maxwell Cleland Atlanta Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center".
Title
Max Cleland VA Medical Center Act
Sponsors
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-17 - House - Final Passage Under Suspension of the Rules Results (Y: 359 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-226. |
2022-12-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 359 - 62, 2 Present (Roll no. 482). (text: 11/14/2022 CR H8457) |
2022-11-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8574) |
2022-11-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3369. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8457-8459) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-07-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-07-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3789-3790) |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3789-3790) |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6244 (Same As) 2022-01-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.