US SB3331 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a land donation and a land exchange involving Rocky Mountain National Park in Colorado. The Department of the Interior may acquire, by donation, approximately 40 acres of identified nonfederal land for inclusion in the Rocky Mountain National Park. Interior shall convey specified federal land to the owner of specified nonfederal land if the owner of the nonfederal land offers to exchange the land. The values of the federal and nonfederal land to be exchanged shall be considered to be of equal value. The nonfederal land that is acquired by Interior shall be administered as part of Rocky Mountain National Park.
Title
Rocky Mountain National Park Boundary Modification and Land Exchange Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5458 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-301.
HB5459 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-302.
SB3068 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3069 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5459 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-302.
SB3068 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3069 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3331/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3331/BILLS-116s3331is.pdf |