US SB333 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2019 This bill allows the Department of Homeland Security to work together with a consortium composed of nonprofit entities to develop, update, and deliver cybersecurity training in support of homeland security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
2019-11-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-11-26HouseReceived in the House.
2019-11-25SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-11-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6768; text: CR S6768)
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
2019-03-12SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-5.
2019-02-13SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-02-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1062 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback