US SB3273 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 558.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 558.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Port Operations, Research, and Technology Act
Title
Port Operations, Research, and Technology Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 558. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-324. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1534 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB6206 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 799.
HB6206 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 799.