US SB327 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-205. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Instructs the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture to make the National Parks and Federal Recreational Lands Pass available, without charge and for the lifetime of the passholder, to (1) any U.S. citizen or person domiciled in the United States who has been medically determined to be permanently disabled, if the citizen or person furnishes adequate proof of the disability and such citizenship or residency; and (2) any veteran who has been found to have a service-connected disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wounded Veterans Recreation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-03SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-205. (TXT | PDF)
2020-12-03SenateSigned by President.
2020-11-24SenatePresented to President.
2020-11-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-11-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 219). (text: CR H5739)
2020-11-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5748-5749)
2020-11-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-11-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 327.
2020-11-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5738-5739)
2020-11-16HouseMr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-06-24HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-06-24HouseReceived in the House.
2020-06-24SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-06-22SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3129; text: CR S3129)
2019-12-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
2019-12-17SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-12-12SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2019-02-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB4930 (Same As) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback