US SB3269 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the recognition of certain Alaska Native communities and the settlement of certain claims under the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Unrecognized Southeast Alaska Native Communities Recognition and Compensation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3231 (Related) 2022-07-20 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Stauber asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 3231, a bill originally introduced by Representative Young, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
HB9116 (Same As) 2022-09-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB9116 (Same As) 2022-09-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3269/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3269/BILLS-117s3269is.pdf |