US SB326 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 326 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 97) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 326 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 97) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a study and clinical trials on the effects of cannabis on certain health outcomes of veterans with chronic pain and post-traumatic stress disorder, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. John Fetterman [D-PA] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed S. 326 RC# 97 (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 326 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 97) entered in Senate. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 42. Record Vote Number: 97. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S1286) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester without amendment. Without written report. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1003 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.