US SB3257 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 311 West Wisconsin Avenue in Tomahawk, Wisconsin, as the "Einar 'Sarge' H. Ingman, Jr. Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 311 West Wisconsin Avenue in Tomahawk, Wisconsin, as the "Einar 'Sarge' H. Ingman, Jr. Post Office Building."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 311 West Wisconsin Avenue in Tomahawk, Wisconsin, as the "Einar 'Sarge' H. Ingman, Jr. Post Office Building".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-11-19HouseReceived in the House.
2020-11-19SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-11-18SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7081; text: CR S7081)
2020-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 443.
2020-03-12SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
2020-03-11SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2020-02-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback