US SB3238 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
READI Act Reliable Emergency Alert Distribution Improvement Act of 2018
Title
READI Act Reliable Emergency Alert Distribution Improvement Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4154 Amendment SA 4154 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4154 Amendment SA 4154 proposed by Senator Crapo for Senator Schatz. (consideration: CR S7735; text: CR S7735) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7734-7735) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6427 (Same As) 2018-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication