US SB3201 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Became Public Law No: 116-114. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Temporary Reauthorization and Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Analogues Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary Reauthorization and Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Analogues Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 32 (Y: 320 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-114. (TXT | PDF)
2020-02-06HouseSigned by President.
2020-02-03HousePresented to President.
2020-01-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-01-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 320 - 88 (Roll no. 32). (text: CR H647)
2020-01-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H701-702)
2020-01-29HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-01-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3201.
2020-01-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H647-653)
2020-01-29HouseMs. Kuster (NH) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-01-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2020-01-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2020-01-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-17HouseReceived in the House.
2020-01-16SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S261-262; text: CR S261-262)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback