US SB3198 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Securities and Exchange Commission to revise any rules necessary to enable issuers of index-linked annuities to register on a form tailored specifically to registered index-linked annuities, and for other purposes.
Title
Registration for Index-Linked Annuities Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7004) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.6506 Amendment SA 6506 proposed by Senator Hassan for Senator Smith. (consideration: CR S7004; text: CR S7004) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.6506 Amendment SA 6506 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7003-7004) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4865 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.