US SB3193 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Places fentanyl-related substances as a class into schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. A schedule I controlled substance is a drug, substance, or chemical that has a high potential for abuse; has no currently accepted medical value; and is subject to regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act. Additionally, the bill prohibits the application of a mandatory minimum prison term for certain drug offenses involving fentanyl-related substances.
Title
Federal Initiative to Guarantee Health by Targeting Fentanyl Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 405. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3193/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3193/BILLS-116s3193pcs.pdf |