US SB3191 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Office of Science and Technology Policy (OSTP) to report to Congress on research and development investments, infrastructure, and workforce development investments of the federal government that enable continued U.S. leadership in industries of the future. The President shall establish or designate an Industries of the Future Coordination Council. The council shall provide the OSTP with advice on ways in which the government can ensure that the United States continues to lead the world in developing emerging technologies that improve the quality of life of the people of the United States, increase U.S. economic competitiveness, and strengthen U.S. national security.
Title
Industries of the Future Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 593. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-300. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6145 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Homeland security
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Homeland security
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication