US SB3185 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area Improvement Act to extend the exception to the closure of certain roads within the Recreation Area for local businesses, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area Improvement Act to extend the exception to the closure of certain roads within the Recreation Area for local businesses, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 535. |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/14/2022 without amendment. With written report No. 117-184. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6364 (Same As) 2022-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.