US SB3179 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7794-7796)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides FY2022 appropriations for several federal departments and agencies, including the Department of the Treasury, the Executive Office of the President, the judiciary, the District of Columbia, and several independent agencies. The independent agencies funded in the bill include the Administrative Conference of the United States, the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, the Consumer Product Safety Commission, the Election Assistance Commission, the Federal Communications Commission, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, the Federal Election Commission, the Federal Labor Relations Authority, the Federal Permitting Improvement Steering Council, the Federal Trade Commission, the General Services Administration, the Harry S. Truman Scholarship Foundation, the Merit Systems Protection Board, the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Foundation, the National Archives and Records Administration, the National Credit Union Administration, the Office of Government Ethics, the Office of Personnel Management, the Office of Special Counsel, the Postal Regulatory Commission, the Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board, the Public Buildings Reform Board, the Securities and Exchange Commission, the Selective Service System, the Small Business Administration, the U.S. Postal Service, and the U.S. Tax Court. The bill also sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this and other appropriations acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Services and General Government Appropriations Act, 2022

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7794-7796)

Same As/Similar To

HB4345 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 54.
HB4502 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Received in the Senate.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.

Subjects

Administrative Conference of the U.S.
Appropriations
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Computer security and identity theft
Consumer affairs
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of the Treasury
Disaster relief and insurance
District of Columbia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economics and public finance
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Federal appellate courts
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal district courts
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Federal Labor Relations Authority
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
General Services Administration
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Intellectual property
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Judicial procedure and administration
Labor-management relations
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Merit Systems Protection Board
National Archives and Records Administration
National Credit Union Administration
Office of Government Ethics
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Office of Special Counsel
Postal Regulatory Commission
Postal service
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board
Product safety and quality
Right of privacy
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Selective Service System
Small business
Small Business Administration
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Specialized courts
State and local courts
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Supreme Court
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Terrorism
U.S. and foreign investments
U.S. Postal Service
U.S. Sentencing Commission
User charges and fees

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback