US SB3176 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 463.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 463.
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2020-05-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2020-01-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB1837 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3722 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Africa
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Alliances
Arab-Israeli relations
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Egypt
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign aid and international relief
Gaza Strip
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
International scientific cooperation
Israel
Jordan
Lebanon
Licensing and registrations
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Morocco
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Strategic materials and reserves
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Tunisia
Water use and supply
West Bank

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback