US SB3176 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 463.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020 This bill provides for security assistance to Israel and authorizes actions to further U.S.-Israel cooperation. Specifically, under the Foreign Military Financing Program, the bill makes no less than $3.3 billion annually available to Israel through FY2028. The bill also extends through FY2025 (1) authority to stockpile war reserves in Israel, and (2) loan guarantees to Israel for up to $9 billion. The President is authorized to transfer munitions from reserve stocks to Israel for its self-defense. Further, the President must report on steps to include Israel in the list of countries eligible for the strategic trade authorization exception, which authorizes exports, reexports, and in-country transfers in lieu of a license that would otherwise be required. Lastly, the President must establish and update contingency plans to provide Israel with defense articles and services necessary for its defense. The Department of State is authorized to (1) enter into memoranda of understanding with Israel with a focus on strengthening mutual ties and cooperation with nations throughout the world; and (2) establish a program between the United States, Israel, and other countries or territories to provide for cooperation in the Middle East region by financing and cooperating in programs related to innovation and advanced technologies. Further, the United States is authorized to enter into cooperative agreements with Israel and developing countries to identify and support local solutions for addressing sustainability challenges. The Department of Defense is authorized to carry out activities with Israel to establish directed energy capabilities that address threats to the United States, deployed forces of the United States, or Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 463.
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2020-05-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2020-01-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB1837 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3722 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Africa
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Alliances
Arab-Israeli relations
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Egypt
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign aid and international relief
Gaza Strip
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
International scientific cooperation
Israel
Jordan
Lebanon
Licensing and registrations
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Morocco
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Strategic materials and reserves
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Tunisia
Water use and supply
West Bank

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback