US SB3170 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CyberTipline Modernization Act of 2018
Title
CyberTipline Modernization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10153-10155) |
2018-12-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10153-10155) |
2018-12-12 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2018-12-12 | House | Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-28 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-09-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.4023 Amendment SA 4023 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.4023 Amendment SA 4023 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S6364) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6364) |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 582. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4738-4740) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4447 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Digital media
Internet and video services
Pornography
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Digital media
Internet and video services
Pornography
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations