US SB316 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a temperature checks pilot program for air transportation, and for other purposes.
Title
Fly Safe and Healthy Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2387 (Same As) 2021-04-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.