US SB3139 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 695.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 695.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to ensure that Federal contractors comply with child labor laws, and for other purposes.
Title
Preventing Child Labor Exploitation in Federal Contracting Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 695. |
2024-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-289. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4978 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
SB2601 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2601 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.