US SB3129 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate certain segments of the Gila River system in the State of New Mexico as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System, to provide for the transfer of administrative jurisdiction over certain Federal land in the State of New Mexico, and for other purposes.
Title
M.H. Dutch Salmon Greater Gila Wild and Scenic River Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 685. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-283. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |