US SB3126 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act to address the hunting, fishing, trapping, and animal gathering rights of the Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act to address the hunting, fishing, trapping, and animal gathering rights of the Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6346 (Same As) 2021-12-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3126/BILLS-117s3126is.pdf |